Mothers' Union

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MOTHERS' UNION DELIVERS ITS CORE OBJECTIVES TO SUPPORT FAMILY LIFE THROUGH THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: COMMUNITY ENGAGEMENT & DEVELOPEMENT, TRAINING AND CAPACITY BUILDING, PRAYER AND FELLOWSHIP, CAMPAIGNING, EMERGENCY RELIEF TO THOSE WHOSE FAMILY LIFE HAS MET WITH ADVERSITY, MEMBERSHIP RESOURCES - TO FACILITATE THE CHARITY'S WORK WITHIN COMMUNITIES WHERE THERE IS A MOTHERS' UNION PRESENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,033,296
Donations and legacies | £2.13m | |
Charitable activities | £15.75k | |
Other trading activities | £566.86k | |
Investments | £315.91k | |
Other | £478 |
Total expenditure:
£2,788,129
Raising funds | £524.71k | |
Charitable activities | £2.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£75,634 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £524.71k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.26m | |
Retained for future use | £245.17k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £524.71k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.26m | |
Retained for future use | £320.80k |
People

25 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
30000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Burundi
- Canada
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Guyana
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Kenya
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 10 May 1965: Standard registration
- 07 February 2024: Funds received from 285061 THE PROVINCE OF THE INDIAN OCEAN SUPPORT ASSOCIATI...
- THE MOTHERS' UNION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIA JAMIESON | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iris Suitor | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CANON CATHERINE HILTON | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Kamwati | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Barton | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Snow | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thembsie Mchunu | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hindle | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Pierrette Bezra EP Rosoanaivo | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roshini Mendis | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheran Roxanna Harper | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23m | £3.33m | £2.61m | £2.48m | £3.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22m | £2.76m | £2.58m | £2.46m | £2.79m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £206.17k | £50.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.96m | £2.63m | £1.86m | £1.71m | £2.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.08m | £553.64k | £462.53k | £532.62k | £566.86k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £171.05k | £0 | £15.75k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £180.47k | £137.83k | £111.07k | £224.47k | £315.91k | |
|
Income - Other | £8.78k | £987 | £0 | £13.10k | £478 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £225.86k | £64.73k | £226.82k | £106.25k | £92.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.29m | £2.00m | £2.09m | £1.90m | £2.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £930.12k | £758.64k | £485.87k | £555.35k | £524.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £232.61k | £70.66k | £73.09k | £92.36k | £68.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £166.37k | £223.83k | £271.44k | £190.25k | £312.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £714.74k | £766.06k | £657.49k | £597.01k | £542.68k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.77m | £2.55m | £2.90m | £2.65m | £2.73m | |
|
Other assets | £637.28k | £937.20k | £964.70k | £683.91k | £1.73m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£260.61k | -£220.30k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £827.56k | £655.43k | £752.60k | £372.30k | £1.12m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 15 JUNE 1926 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1974, AND 8 FEBRUARY 1995, AND BYE-LAWS DATED 28 JUNE 1995, 17 SEPTEMBER 2002, 10 OCTOBER 2002 AND 9 APRIL 2008 as amended by an Order in Council on 24 Apr 2018 as amended by an Order in Council on 24 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO UPHOLD CHRIST'S TEACHING ON THE NATURE OF MARRIAGE AND TO PROMOTE ITS WIDER UNDERSTANDING. 2) TO ENCOURAGE PARENTS TO BRING UP THEIR CHILDREN IN THE FAITH AND LIFE OF THE CHURCH. 3) TO MAINTAIN A WORLD-WIDE FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIANS UNITED IN PRAYER, WORSHIP AND SERVICE. 4) TO PROMOTE CONDITIONS IN SOCIETY FAVOURABLE TO STABLE FAMILY LIFE AND THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN, AND 5) TO HELP THOSE WHOSE FAMILY LIFE HAS MET WITH ADVERSITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mothers'union
24 Tufton Street
London
SW1P 3RB
- Phone:
- 02072225533
- Email:
- mu@mothersunion.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window