CAPTAIN WILLIAM SHORT

Charity number: 242093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes contributions to elderly people in Totnes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £214
Total expenditure: £215

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Cunningham Horsburgh Trustee 20 January 2021
THE CHARITY OF DOUGLAS WILLIAM MITCHELL
Received: 22 days late
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Philip Charles Paine Trustee 18 May 2015
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Barbara Ada May Bowhay Trustee 02 June 2014
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Marion Janet Adams Trustee
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
PRUW BOSWELL HARPER Trustee
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
JOHN FREDERICK NIGEL HEAL Trustee
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
ALAN LANGMAID Trustee
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
JUNE PROWSE Trustee
KELLOCK GIFT
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGDON
Received: On time
BOWDEN GIFT
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
TOTNES ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
VARIOUS MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £200 £204 £208 £214 £214
Total expenditure £200 £205 £210 £210 £215
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TINGRITH
ASHBURTON ROAD
TOTNES
TQ9 5JU
Phone:
01803863753
Website:

No information available