THE RADNORSHIRE SOCIETY

Charity Number: 243372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Radnorshire Society is concerned with the old Welsh county of Radnorshire founded in 1930. It organises an annual programme of public lectures and excursions. It maintains an important local history archive and library and publishes its own 'Transactions', incorporating new research and archive material. There is a Field Section which co-ordinates separate talks, research and field trips.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £10,424
Total expenditure: £7,124

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 1965: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 06 October 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 March 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 April 2012: Re-registered
  • 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 05 December 2014: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Timothy St John Haines Trustee 11 November 2023
None on record
Clive Barrett Trustee 16 November 2019
None on record
Michael Reynolds Trustee 16 November 2019
None on record
Vic Pardoe Trustee 16 November 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Newman Trustee 12 November 2018
None on record
MRS ANNE GOODWIN Trustee
OLD RADNOR PARISH HALL (WALTON HALL)
Received: On time
JENNIFER ANN LEWIS Trustee
None on record
RUTH LEWIS JONES Trustee
None on record
DAI HAWKINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £9.48k £9.48k £5.78k £12.42k £10.42k
Total expenditure £7.34k £6.78k £5.20k £6.52k £7.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 September 2020 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dolmynach House
Bridge Street
RHAYADER
LD6 5AG
Phone:
01597851685