Governance THE RADNORSHIRE SOCIETY
Charity number: 243372

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 14 July 1965: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 October 2009: Standard registration
- 09 March 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 April 2012: Re-registered
- 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 December 2014: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.