Financial history CHARITY OF JULIA DODSON CARDEW FOR THE ASSISTANT CLERGY

Charity number: 243411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.97k £2.04k £2.11k £2.12k £2.15k
Total expenditure £1.97k £2.04k £2.11k £2.12k £2.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A