Financial history Winforton Unknown Donors Charity

Charity number: 243742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.40k £4.55k £4.74k £4.23k £5.13k
Total expenditure £2.24k £1.98k £4.26k £2.90k £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A