Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF ANNIE KEW, OTHERWISE SHERWOOD HOUSE

Charity number: 244571
Charity reporting is up to date (109 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 February 2025 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 February 2025 475 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 March 2024 490 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 March 2024 855 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1642 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1642 days