Trustees THE SOMERTON CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 244670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Mary Swan Trustee 29 October 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, SOMERTON
Received: On time
THE READING ROOM CHARLTON MACKRELL
Received: On time
Stephen Thomas John Davis Trustee 03 November 2023
None on record
Alan Hilbourne Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
RODGER RAY CALDERWOOD Trustee 05 November 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, SOMERTON
Received: On time
Mary Ann Pike Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record