Financial history SAXLINGHAM UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 244713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.91k £7.97k £7.98k £9.72k £10.05k
Total expenditure £10.55k £6.80k £7.63k £8.22k £9.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A