Financial history DOCTOR M A GERRARD'S GOTHAM OLD PEOPLE'S BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 244908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.20k £1.22k £1.24k £1.29k £1.39k
Total expenditure £250 £0 £600 £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A