NEEDHAM TOWN LANDS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 245267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO HELP THE POOR AND NEEDY OF THE PARISH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £415
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEEDHAM TOWNS LAND TRUST (Working name)
  • TOWN LANDS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL OWEN TUFFNELL Chair 20 September 2012
NEEDHAM TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
TOWN LANDS ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
KING GEORGE'S HALL
Received: On time
Gillian Powell Trustee 01 November 2017
NEEDHAM TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
TOWN LANDS ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £822 £806 £414 £415 £415
Total expenditure £411 £806 £0 £394 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 SWAN LANE
HARLESTON
IP20 9AN
Phone:
01379 308905
Website:

No information available