BRADFORD ON AVON PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND OPEN HISTORIC BUILDINGS, MAKE GRANTS. MOUNT EXHIBITIONS AND LECTURES, MONITOR AND COMMENT ON PLANNING ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 May 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Potter | Chair | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marian Heselton | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gilllian Isobel Livingstone | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel George Wiltshire | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Regina Nevin | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Eberlin | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Nicholls | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Macgregor | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.14k | £32.28k | £44.64k | £46.90k | £52.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.77k | £55.84k | £68.45k | £40.75k | £62.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH JANUARY 1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 MARCH 1967 AND 13 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THIS TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (I) TO MAINTAIN, FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE PARTICULAR CHARACTER AND THE SCENIC, HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL VALUES OF BUILDINGS AND LANDS IN THE TOWN OF BRADFORD-ON-AVON IN THE COUNTY OF WILTS AND THE AREA ADJACENT THERETO (ALL HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE "SAID AREA") AND TO ENSURE AND PROMOTE THE INTEGRATION OF NEW BUILDINGS INTO THE SAID AREA. (II) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION AND EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF ARTEFACTS RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF THE SAID AREA.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD-ON-AVON AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silver Street House
Silver Street
Bradford on Avon
Wiltshire
BA15 1JY
- Phone:
- 01225 865733
- Email:
- hello@bradfordheritage.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window