MARKET HILL ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide housing for retired single or widowed ladies or retired married couples of the parish of St. Mary's Church, Cowes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 10 January 1966: Standard registration
- MACNAMARA ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR C J BUCKETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Diana Chichester | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SPENCER | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mary Park WINDER | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.30k | £8.45k | £7.73k | £7.28k | £6.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £2.40k | £4.88k | £2.65k | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED THE 28TH OCTOBER 1880 (U.V. 154 P.120) AUGMENTED BY WILL PROVED IN P.R. ON THE 1ST FEBRUARY 1910 AND SCHEMES OF THE 5TH JANUARY 1967 AND 18TH JANUARY 1972
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR AND AGED WIDOWS OR UNMARRIED WOMEN OVER 60 YEARS OF AGE OR AGED MARRIED COUPLES OF REPUTABLE LIFE, INHABITANTS OF WEST COWES OR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF NORTHWOOD PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
WEST COWES AND ANCIENT PARISH OF NORTHWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 St Johns Road
St Johns Road
NEWPORT
Isle of Wight
PO30 1LS
- Phone:
- 07887685584
- Email:
- chrisbuckett@uwclub.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window