LLANGOLLEN URBAN, LLANGOLLEN RURAL AND GLYNTRAIAN WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 246128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of financial assistance to those in need or sickness who live in the areas of Llangollen Urban, Llangollen Rural and Glyntraian Community Councils either directly or through other organisations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £2,359
Total expenditure: £3,150

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Denbighshire
  • Wrexham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Lee Anthony Taylor Chair 27 June 2019
None on record
Anglela Williams Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
Moira Griffiths Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Alma Morris Pierson Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Margaret Olwen Smith Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record
Davena April Rose Davies Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Edith Eva Jones Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Rev Philip John Carey Trustee 12 September 2019
VALLE CRUCIS MISSION AREA CIO
Recently registered
VALLE CRUCIS MISSION AREA
Received: On time
Keith Sinclair Trustee 27 June 2019
FRONCYSYLLTE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION'S VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Jean Robb McKean Grindley Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
George Hughes Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
VERA HEATH Trustee
None on record
NESTA OWEN HUGHES Trustee
VALLE CRUCIS MISSION AREA
Received: On time
SUNDAY SCHOOL AND MISSION ROOM
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF LLANGOLLEN HEALTH CENTRE
Received: 7 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £2.38k £2.38k £2.31k £2.35k £2.36k
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.65k £1.76k £2.05k £3.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 15 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 7 SEPTEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF LLANGOLLEN AND THE PARISHES OF LLANGOLLEN RURAL AND GLYNTRAIAN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 07 September 1971 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Hafan
Fron Bache
Llangollen
LL20 7BW
Phone:
01978 861237
Website:

No information available