Accounts and annual returns EASTWOOD MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 246672
Charity reporting is overdue by 1292 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 196 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 196 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 562 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 562 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 927 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 927 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1292 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1292 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required