Financial history STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 246968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.92k £17.66k £18.42k £20.55k £21.42k
Total expenditure £17.08k £3.77k £12.67k £12.61k £21.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A