Financial history THOMAS HERBERT CLARK'S CHARITY

Charity number: 246969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.18k £7.54k £12.14k £11.59k £10.73k
Total expenditure £11.92k £14.80k £1.98k £3.47k £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A