THOMAS HERBERT CLARK'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 246969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintaining four bungalows occupied by elderly tenants

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,729
Total expenditure: £10,172

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CLARK'S CHARITY STICKNEY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sonja Vogelsberg Trustee 10 September 2024
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
Simon Hill Trustee 16 January 2024
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
Neil King Mr Trustee 14 November 2023
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
LUCY EDWARDS Trustee 17 December 2017
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
Karen Sherriff Trustee 15 December 2017
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
WILLIAM LOVELL'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Trevor Cash Trustee 25 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.18k £7.54k £12.14k £11.59k £10.73k
Total expenditure £11.92k £14.80k £1.98k £3.47k £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 July 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 November 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Fieldside House
Main Road
Stickney
BOSTON
Lincolnshire
PE22 8AG
Phone:
01205480463
Website:

No information available