Trustees THOMAS HERBERT CLARK'S CHARITY

Charity number: 246969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sonja Vogelsberg Trustee 10 September 2024
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
Simon Hill Trustee 16 January 2024
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
Neil King Mr Trustee 14 November 2023
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
LUCY EDWARDS Trustee 17 December 2017
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
Karen Sherriff Trustee 15 December 2017
JOHN ROBINSON
Received: On time
STICKNEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
WILLIAM LOVELL'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Trevor Cash Trustee 25 May 2016
None on record