Financial history REBECCA GUEST ROBINSON

Charity number: 247266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.21k £2.26k £2.33k £2.35k £2.37k
Total expenditure £1.58k £2.20k £2.85k £2.27k £2.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A