REBECCA GUEST ROBINSON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide modest financial assistance to individuals resident in the villages of Birwell and Worsbro Village,in order to alleviate acute personal hardship or distress which cannot be relieved from public funds and to offer modest financial support to other organisation/charities providing assistance to residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnsley
Governance
- 18 March 1966: Standard registration
- THE ROBINSON BEQUEST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ARMITAGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Steve Chapman | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Oglanby | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Geoffrey Hufton | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tomas Mathew Isherwood | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|||||
KEITH BURKINSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.21k | £2.26k | £2.33k | £2.35k | £2.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58k | £2.20k | £2.85k | £2.27k | £2.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 17TH MARCH, 1950 AT WAKEFIELD. OPINION AND ADVICE DATED 29TH JANUARY, 1952.
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF POOR AND DESERVING PEOPLE BONAFIDE RESIDENT IN THE VILLAGE OF BIRDWELL.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF BIRDWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 ST. MARYS GARDEN
WORSBROUGH
BARNSLEY
S70 5LU
- Phone:
- 01226290179
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window