Financial history THE LANGDALE TRUST

Charity Number: 247300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.08k £15.13k £17.86k £41.44k £38.88k
Total expenditure £28.21k £9.97k £11.73k £45.87k £39.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.00k N/A N/A