THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SWIMMING CLUBS FOR THE HANDICAPPED (N A S C H )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main function of NASCH is to act as a co-ordinating body for its affiliated member clubs. We recognise the immense value of swimming for disabled people. NASCH organises swimming galas throughout the country and runs an annual swimming camp for members of the clubs at which the AGM is held. The Association provides subsidised Public Liability insurance for clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 November 1966: Standard registration
- N A S C H (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB HUNT | Chair | 22 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Noel FRAREY | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
MS LORRAINE BOOTH | Trustee |
|
||||||
David Crafter | Trustee |
|
||||||
TRACEY KITCHING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.41k | £15.15k | £22.01k | £16.39k | £32.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.13k | £28.99k | £20.72k | £22.39k | £26.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6 APRIL 1997, AMENDED 4 APRIL 1998, 17 APRIL 1999, APRIL 2001.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP SWIMMING FOR THE PHYSICAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL BENEFIT OF HANDICAPPED PERSONS (II) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE SWIMMING CLUBS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FACILITIES FOR SWIMMING BY HANDICAPPED PERSONS AND TO ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH CLUBS AND FACILITIES (III) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE THE TUITION OF SWIMMING TO HANDICAPPED PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Court Farm Road
Mottingham
London
SE9 4JN
- Phone:
- 01329833689
- Email:
- naschswim@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window