Financial history THE LUTON ROTARY CHARITY

Charity number: 247879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £20.12k £13.05k £5.52k £16.59k £13.97k
Total expenditure £13.32k £22.37k £5.99k £16.98k £14.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A