ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WEST DORSET BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes the work and objects of the National RSPCA being to prevent cruelty, promote kindness to and alleviate suffering of animals, in the West Dorset and Axminster Devon area. It takes into care and rehomes unwanted and stray pets, assists owners with payment for veterinary treatment, and contributes to South West regional RSPCA schemes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 13 July 1966: Standard registration
- RSPCA DORSET WEST BRANCH (Working name)
- TAYLORS ANIMAL REHOMING CENTRE (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS DORSET WEST BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA DORSET WEST BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Westcott | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Fiona Cartwright | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Cox | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elgar | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jeanne Pengelly | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fisher | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £461.30k | £319.65k | £340.97k | £294.09k | £301.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.68k | £336.47k | £346.23k | £359.03k | £360.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £77.86k | £53.77k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED 15 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219009)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
WEST DORSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RSPCA Taylor's Rehoming Centre
Higher Dairy
Kingston Maurward College
Kingston Maurward
DORCHESTER Dorset
DT2 8PY
- Phone:
- 01305259672
- Email:
- mail@westdorsetrspca.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window