Financial history THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF TRURO BRANCH)

Charity number: 249867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.41k £5.41k £6.25k £6.64k £7.66k
Total expenditure £9.91k £4.09k £7.09k £6.19k £7.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A