THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF BLACKBURN BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mothers' Union works to support families both locally and worldwide by fulfilling our aims and objects. Work is undertaken by members who are involved in social policy issues and who raise funds to support our overseas work. On a local level our members offer practical support to families in Lancashire and throughout the Anglican Communion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
2138 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 November 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Ann Willoughby | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elaine Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE GELDARD | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Elaine Barber | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucille Joyce Porter | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Cairns | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Carey | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Johnston | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kath Bill | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SIMS | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHARON BATES | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN LANE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.92k | £113.54k | £121.40k | £158.41k | £161.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.89k | £138.36k | £132.13k | £162.93k | £159.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
1.TO UPHOLD CHRIST'S TEACHING ON THE NATURE OF MARRIAGE AND TO PROMOTE ITS WIDER UNDERSTANDING.2.TO ENCOURAGE PARENTS TO BRING UP THEIR CHILDREN IN THE FAITH AND LIFE OF THE CHURCH.3.TO MAINTAIN A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIANS,UNITED IN PRAYER,WORSHIP AND SERVICE.4.TO PROMOTE CONDITIONS IN SOCIETY FAVOURABLE TO STABLE FAMILY LIFE AND FOR THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN.5.TO HELP THOSE WHOSE FAMILY LIFE HAS MET WITH ADVERSITY.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF BLACKBURN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 GLENMORE
CHORLEY
PR6 7TA
- Phone:
- 01772324376
- Email:
- MOTHERSUNIONBBD@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window