THE BRITISH CHAROLAIS CATTLE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 250018
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activities of the charity are the registration and genetic evaluation of Charolais cattle registered in the United Kingdom. Research work is carried out with various scientific organisations looking into efficient beef production, and improving the taste and tenderness of beef produced from Charolais cattle.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 1966: Standard registration
  • 26 November 2024: Funds received from 506849 THE EAST MIDLANDS REGIONAL AREA ASSOCIATION OF THE...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BRITISH CHAROLAIS CATTLE SOCIETY (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Robert Paynter Chair 23 June 2022
None on record
Darren Herbert Knox Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Colin John Wight Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Will Tucker Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Richard James Kimber Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Andrew John Stott Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Neil Blyth Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Robert McWilliams Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
Michael Victor Atkinson Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
David Bothwell Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Andrew Clark Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Matthew Alexander Milne Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
Tracey Nicoll Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
Richard Arwel Owen Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
William Owen Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
Jeremy Price Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £680.18k £666.59k £657.61k £712.62k £728.74k
Total expenditure £692.66k £564.81k £585.84k £713.01k £627.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.82k £10.25k £32.00k £100.70k £73.85k
Income - Other trading activities £32.83k £25.35k £25.18k £38.68k £70.55k
Income - Charitable activities £505.56k £516.61k £484.11k £448.65k £459.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £125.97k £114.37k £116.33k £124.59k £124.61k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £664.96k £551.20k £563.36k £682.08k £593.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.69k £13.61k £22.48k £30.93k £33.96k
Expenditure - Governance £36.66k £19.77k £44.86k £62.99k £54.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £428.19k £411.84k £396.41k £385.57k £371.24k
Long-term investments £2.41m £2.47m £2.81m £2.69m £2.96m
Other assets £198.23k £262.94k £353.81k £231.04k £226.01k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £102.28k £100.02k £117.90k £134.85k £100.08k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 November 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 November 2024 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRITISH CHAROLAIS CATTLE SOCIETY LT
AVENUE M
NATIONAL AGRICULTURAL CENTRE
STONELEIGH PARK
KENILWORTH
CV8 2RG
Phone:
02476697222