Financial history CONTEMPORARY DANCE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 250216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.38m £7.35m £7.19m £9.36m £10.60m
Total expenditure £7.02m £6.77m £7.32m £8.63m £10.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.52m £3.15m £2.11m £4.10m £4.55m
Income - Donations and legacies £419.74k £320.40k £376.78k £415.84k £661.13k
Income - Other trading activities £211.15k £47.25k £231.04k £311.81k £325.30k
Income - Charitable activities £6.74m £6.98m £6.58m £8.58m £9.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.22k £3.95k £5.60k £53.16k £151.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.52m £6.24m £6.67m £7.91m £9.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £497.41k £535.11k £647.52k £718.38k £763.21k
Expenditure - Governance £104.31k £91.35k £85.01k £83.01k £89.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0