Trustees PHILHARMONIA LTD
Charity number: 250277

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord King of Lothbury Mervyn Allister King | Chair | 10 September 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID KEITH PICKARD | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|||||
David Charles Aitman | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terence Rhodes Sinclair | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Alexander Rolton | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Cornall | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nick Bishop | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johanne Hudson | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stoneman | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Milone | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Soong Choo | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Whitehead | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hedger | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hogg | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Samuel Buckle | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.