FORCES WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 250335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

See Report and Accounts

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £45,370
Total expenditure: £16,722

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1967: Standard registration
  • 06 January 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHURCH OF ENGLAND BOARD FOR THE WELFARE OF HER MAJESTY'S FORCES WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF SALISBURY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Jackman Chair 01 April 2015
ALEXANDER MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
DEW LONG AND LONG CHARITIES
Received: On time
ARTHUR R WHITE - BELL RINGERS FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CAROLINE P ANSTRUTHER MACKAY
Received: On time
SARAH J HINTON
Received: On time
ARTHUR R WHITE - CHURCH FUNDS
Received: On time
SUTTON VENY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Rev Mark Robert Christian Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Rev Gary James Birch Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Lt Col Andrew Ledger OBE Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Alexander Goodwin Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Lt Col Daniel John Rawlins Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Dr Lydia Brown Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Rev Christopher Shimmen Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Group Captain Michael Geoffrey Oldham Trustee 12 May 2020
None on record
Rev Stephen Robbins Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Lt Col Mark John Robert Nash Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
Jane Guyer Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
Lt Col Richard Miller Trustee 01 August 2015
THE SMALL ARMS SCHOOL CORPS INFANTRY WEAPONS COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £42.09k £40.89k £41.18k £42.83k £45.37k
Total expenditure £58.07k £54.76k £34.30k £18.60k £16.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 March 2022 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 March 2022 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE SOLDIERS OF THE CROWN WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF SALISBURY.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF SALISBURY
Registration history
  • 02 June 1967 : Standard registration
  • 06 January 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Seniors Farmhouse
Semley
Shaftesbury
SP7 9AX
Phone:
01747850194
Website:

No information available