THE PROVIDENCE HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 250368
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providence House Christian Centre operates a regular pattern of Christain activities on Sunday, with Sunday School and Bible Studies. As part of our community programme we run residential trips in partnership with the Shallowford Farm Trust. The work of Providence House Trust also oversees the youth club and community programme that runs within the centre.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £35,311
Total expenditure: £28,929

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 1966: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 29 October 2009: Standard registration
  • 20 April 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 20 April 2020: Funds transferred to 1181473 THE PROVIDENCE HOUSE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £18.12k £31.60k £6.39k £31.77k £35.31k
Total expenditure £6.84k £8.70k £18.68k £25.42k £28.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required