Financial history THE NEWMAN TRUST

Charity number: 251158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £377.34k £243.74k £380.38k £456.84k £444.09k
Total expenditure £314.05k £315.85k £353.93k £354.43k £525.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A