WYCLIFFE UK LIMITED

Charity number: 251233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Wycliffe UK exists to enable all peoples to engage with the Bible in a language which speaks to their heart. Activities focus on raising awareness of the need for Bible translation into languages without Christian Scripture, and resourcing international partners with people, prayer, and financial support to enable successful translation projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Angola
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Bangladesh
  • Benin
  • Botswana
  • Brazil
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Central African Republic
  • Chad
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Costa Rica
  • Czech Republic
  • Ethiopia
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Hong Kong
  • Hungary
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ivory Coast
  • Kenya
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Mali
  • Mexico
  • Mozambique
  • Namibia
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Northern Ireland
  • Norway
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Philippines
  • Poland
  • Romania
  • Scotland
  • Senegal
  • Slovakia
  • South Africa
  • South Korea
  • South Sudan
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • Togo
  • Turkey
  • Uganda
  • United States
  • Vietnam
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 1967: Standard registration
  • 27 October 2022: Funds received from 1075557 THE RICON TRUST
  • 11 October 2023: Funds received from 1178711 NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WBT (Working name)
  • WYCLIFFE BIBLE TRANSLATORS (Working name)
  • WYCLIFFE UK (Working name)
  • VISION 2025 (Previous name)
  • WYCLIFFE CENTRE (Previous name)
  • WYNET (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Jules Steinegger Chair 13 June 2013
COLKINS MILL CHURCH
Received: On time
STEWARDSHIP SERVICES (UKET) LIMITED
Received: On time
Rachel Louise Bradley Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Mary Jane Comont Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Folajimi Ayodele Adedoyin Trustee 29 September 2021
CHRISTIANS AGAINST POVERTY
Received: On time
James Turner Trustee 18 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM
Received: On time
Rebecca Helen Jean Benton Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
Kevin Stewart Ashman Trustee 13 December 2017
OMF INTERNATIONAL (UK)
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL SERVICE FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Received: On time
DR Ian Kenneth Kirby Trustee 15 December 2016
None on record
KENNETH MACANGUS MACKENZIE Trustee 01 December 1995
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £7.26m £7.19m £8.35m £9.38m £9.34m
Total expenditure £8.19m £7.83m £7.86m £8.64m £9.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.11m £7.04m £8.30m £9.29m £9.12m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £15.46k £17.12k £15.37k £10.66k £16.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £126.56k £106.34k £36.75k £32.48k £206.02k
Income - Other £5.98k £25.13k £1.91k £42.93k £2.03k
Income - Legacies £690.23k £369.85k £690.03k £1.19m £381.56k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.67m £7.50m £7.56m £8.25m £8.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £519.65k £328.57k £306.49k £387.98k £782.27k
Expenditure - Governance £19.70k £18.76k £28.03k £38.23k £34.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.24m £1.11m £1.12m £1.76m £2.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £21.04k £19.26k £6.31k £7.96k £12.19k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £43.63k £0 £0 £0 £29.72k
Long-term investments £5.71m £1.70m £1.84m £1.57m £2.73m
Other assets £1.33m £4.57m £5.17m £5.98m £4.81m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £316.11k £253.63k £236.13k £320.09k £252.91k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 16 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 11 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 06 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 14 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wycliffe Bible Translators
CMS House
Watlington Road
Oxford
OX4 6BZ
Phone:
0300 303 1111