Financial history CIRENCESTER CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 251381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.74k £4.36k £5.08k £6.88k £7.01k
Total expenditure £3.59k £2.00k £3.41k £3.75k £9.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A