Trustees CIRENCESTER CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity Number: 251381

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Boydell | Chair | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Julia Tuttle | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edwin Tuttle | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Prof Peter Vujakovic | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Ibbotson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Kay | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin Green | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mark Fearn | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CECIL HARBORD | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Selwyn | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.