Financial history TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH THE EPISCOPAL CHURCH IN EGYPT

Charity number: 253591
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.81k £13.00k £13.51k £13.79k £14.13k
Total expenditure £12.92k £13.78k £13.00k £13.78k £3.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A