Trustees TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH THE EPISCOPAL CHURCH IN EGYPT
Charity number: 253591

Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Right Reverend Anthony James BALL | Chair | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev David Longe | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Carol Anne HAWKEY | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Catherine Mary Dawkins | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr CLARE AMOS | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
THE JERUSALEM AND THE EAST MISSION TRUST | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
JOHN MULLIN CLARK | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
DAVID ALAN WRIGHT OBE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.