MOUNT VERNON HOSPITAL COMFORTS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of services and equipment for comfort and benefit of patients and staff at mount vernon hospital in Northwood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 23 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Elkeles | Chair | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Charis Burland | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrea Norman | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
John Laycock | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Gillian Andrew | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Sharad Kanabar | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Newell | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.03k | £97.81k | £70.01k | £80.94k | £95.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.54k | £7.49k | £170.04k | £7.97k | £57.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODE CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OR FORMER PATIENTS OF THE MOUNT VERNON HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIEM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
MOUNT VERNON HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 DUCKS HILL ROAD
NORTHWOOD
HA6 2NW
- Phone:
- 01923450981
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window