Accounts and annual returns SAXLINGHAM RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 254689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 30 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 24 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 06 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 23 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required