Financial history BARNSLEY FRIENDS ADULT SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 255907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.40k £3.59k £3.82k £4.28k £4.28k
Total expenditure £60 £2.33k £523 £725 £2.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A