POOR AND PUBLIC PURPOSES FOR THE ANCIENT HAMLET OF NASH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of allotment gardens and the repair and maintenance of the property. Any excess funds being used for the poor and public services within the parish, by means of grants or loans to individuals or organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 09 July 1968: Standard registration
- 12 June 1998: Removed (Duplicate registration)
- NASH ALLOTMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- POOR'S STOCK OR LAND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND JOHN FREDERICK KING BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MILES STUART HEDGES | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS HENRY EGGLESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH JANE DENNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434 | £320 | £305 | £310 | £293 | |
|
Total expenditure | £80 | £80 | £80 | £80 | £80 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18TH AUGUST 1908 AS AMENDED ON 19TH OCTOBER 1998 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(C) AND 74(2)(D)(1) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS IN THE ANCIENT HAMLET OF NASH AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 24 OF THE SCHEME) ANY SURPLUS INCOME MAY BE APPLIED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ANCIENT HAMLET OF NASH AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
ANCIENT HAMLET OF NASH
Linked charities
- 09 July 1968 : Standard registration
- 12 June 1998 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Wood End
Nash
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 0EL
- Phone:
- 01908501860
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window