THE CHESHIRE YEOMANRY REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Association are as follows: (a) To maintain and promote a fellowship and association between past and present members of the Cheshire Yeomanry. (b) To promote the welfare of past and present members of the Cheshire Yeomanry and to provide an organisation and means of relief in cases of hardship or distress among members. (c) To provide an organisation to represent and safeguard
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Flintshire
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 17 June 1963: Standard registration
- C Y R A (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Peter Marshall Cooper TD | Chair | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Major Rupert William Nield Collis | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Major William Nigel Wynne Bankes | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew Benjamin Clegg | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Major Steven Paul Holland | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gladding | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hammond | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Compston TD | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Nicholas Charles Glazebrook | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Ledsham | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|||||
MAJOR SIR JAMES LINDSAY BT | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN CLIVE MARK HODGKINSON VR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLONEL NIGEL LYSAGHT HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.99k | £9.73k | £26.64k | £20.97k | £16.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.24k | £5.63k | £28.64k | £28.22k | £10.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 5TH JANUARY 1967
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND PROMOTE A FELLOWSHIP AND ASSOCIATION BETWEEN PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT. TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND TO PROVIDE ORGANISATION AND MEANS OF RELIEF IN CASES OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONG MEMBERS (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE RULES)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C (CHESHIRE YEOMANRY) SQUADRON
The Queen's Own Yeomanry
FOX BARRACKS
Moston
Chester
CH2 4BU
- Phone:
- 01244381050
- Email:
- nlhill@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window