Accounts and annual returns THE SANDWICH SOCIETY

Charity number: 256985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 15 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 March 2025 258 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 July 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 July 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required