Financial history THE SANDWICH SOCIETY

Charity number: 256985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.24k £1.23k £470 £605 £492
Total expenditure £1.23k £1.07k £824 £67 £86
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A