THE SANDWICH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Society is to act as a vehicle to gather the views of members, act as a pressure group to protect the things we value in Sandwich ie buildings etc and contribute opinion on the various issues that may affect us.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 21 October 1968: Standard registration
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 February 2015: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Winston Moorhouse | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £1.23k | £470 | £605 | £492 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £1.07k | £824 | £67 | £86 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 March 2025 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH JULY 1968
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF (A) HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING; (B) PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE BEAUTY AND HISTORIC CHARACTER OF THE TOWN OF SANDWICH; (C) THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF BUILDINGS AND OTHER FEATURES OF HISTORIC INTEREST, AND THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROTECTION OF OPEN SPACES.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF SANDWICH AND ITS SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 HAZELWOOD MEADOW
SANDWICH
CT13 0AR
- Phone:
- 07786062685
- Email:
- mark.moorhouse@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window