The Association of Wrens and Women of the Royal Naval Services

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
307 Provides advocacy/advice/information 309 Acts as umbrella or resource body
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Canada
- New Zealand
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 March 1969: Standard registration
- 15 May 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF WRENS (Previous name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF WRENS (WOMEN OF THE ROYAL NAVAL SERVICES) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Talbot | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lancaster | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Holmes | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Vanson | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ottley | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Houghton | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Cross | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA WRIGLEY | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNE LOUISE CAMERON | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janette Crisp | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.73k | £76.89k | £210.39k | £103.81k | £123.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.29k | £99.05k | £151.37k | £101.39k | £99.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTION OF THE ASSOCIATION OF WRENS REVISED 14 MARCH 1969, 26 OCTOBER 1975, 1991, 27 OCTOBER 2001 AND 22 OCTOBER 2011 AS AMENDED ON 24 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED ON 10 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 24 SEP 2016 as amended on 20 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are to promote the efficiency of women in the Royal Naval Services in the following ways: a) Celebrating past and current achievements, preserving the history and traditions, fostering esprit-de-corps and comradeship and encouraging personnel to benefit from the experience of former members of said Service and of their predecessors in the Women's Royal Naval Service ("WRNS"), in particular, but not exclusively, by maintaining contact and binding together in practical friendship with each other. b) Where necessary refer former serving members of the WRNS and serving and retired women of the Royal Naval Services and their dependants to the appropriate service charity or charities.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 21 March 1969 : Standard registration
- 15 May 2012 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Building 1/87
Scott Road
H M Naval Base
Portsmouth
Hants
PO1 3LU
- Phone:
- 02392725141
- Email:
- office@wrens.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window