Financial history THORPE ST ANDREW TRUST

Charity number: 257209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £1.83k £2.05k £645 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.93k £3.00k £3.55k £3.62k £24.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A