Financial history THE COOKHAM SOCIETY

Charity Number: 257224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.72k £4.77k £4.67k £5.20k £7.11k
Total expenditure £3.41k £3.10k £4.44k £3.11k £4.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A