Financial history CHARITY OF JOSEPH HAGUE FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 258092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £79 £0 £176 £0 £147
Total expenditure £130 £0 £180 £0 £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A